EP0221025 - Heterocyclic analogs of mevalonolactone and derivatives thereof, processes for their production and their use as pharmaceuticals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
ES
FR
GB
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
SANDOZ AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | For:DE
SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH Humboldtstrasse 3 79539 Lörrach / DE | For:AT
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | For:BE
CH
ES
FR
GB
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
SANDOZ AG Lichtstrasse 35 CH-4002 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH Humboldtstrasse 3 D-79539 Lörrach / DE | |||
For:AT
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 A-1235 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wareing, James Richard 402 Millbrook Avenue Randolph, N.J. 07801 / US | 02 /
Damon, Robert Edson 23156 West View Wharton, N.J. 07885 / US | [1987/19] | Application number, filing date | 86810470.4 | 21.10.1986 | [1987/19] | Priority number, date | US19850791198 | 25.10.1985 Original published format: US 791198 | US19860816664 | 07.01.1986 Original published format: US 816664 | [1987/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0221025 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/337, C07D307/54, C07D333/24, A61K31/34, A61K31/38, A61K31/40 | [1987/19] | CPC: |
C07D207/337 (EP,KR);
C07D307/54 (EP);
C07D333/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/19] | Title | German: | Heterocyclische Analoga von Mevalonolacton und Derivate hiervon, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung sowie deren Verwendung als Pharmazeutika | [1987/19] | English: | Heterocyclic analogs of mevalonolactone and derivatives thereof, processes for their production and their use as pharmaceuticals | [1987/19] | French: | Analogues hétérocycliques de la mévalonolactone et dérivés de ceux-ci, leur procédé de préparation et leur application comme médicaments | [1987/19] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 23.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/19] | 16.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3168532 [ ] (WILLARD SHORT FRANKLIN); | DE1695941 [ ] (UPJOHN CO); | DE2261965 [ ] (CONTINENTAL PHARMA); | US4035394 [ ] (PELOSI JR STANFORD S, et al); | EP0114027 [ ] (SANDOZ AG [CH], et al); | EP0117228 [ ] (SANDOZ AG [CH], et al); | DE3309355 [ ] (BASF AG [DE]); | AT377255B [ ] (RICHTER GEDEON VEGYESZET [HU]); | EP0155524 [ ] (NATTERMANN A & CIE [DE]); | WO8600307 [ ] (SANDOZ AG [CH]); | WO8603488 [ ] (SANDOZ AG [CH]) |