EP0224441 - Plant growth regulating agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.1991 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.06.1991 [1991/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/23] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seiler, Alfred, Dr. Schaffhauserstrasse 51 CH-4332 Stein / CH | 02 /
Kerber, Elmar, Dr. Steineggweg 14 D-7884 Rickenbach / DE | [1987/23] | Application number, filing date | 86810501.6 | 03.11.1986 | [1987/23] | Priority number, date | CH19850004803 | 08.11.1985 Original published format: CH 480385 | [1987/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0224441 | Date: | 03.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0224441 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A01N47/36, // (A01N47/36, 37:44, 37:42) | [1987/23] | CPC: |
A01N47/36 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N47/36, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N47/36, A01N37/44, A01N37/42 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/23] | Title | German: | Pflanzenwuchsregulierendes Mittel | [1987/23] | English: | Plant growth regulating agents | [1987/23] | French: | Agents régulateurs de la croissance des plantes | [1987/23] | Examination procedure | 05.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/23] | 27.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0126713 |