EP0217763 - Hinge for spectacle frames [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POZ S.n.c. di DE LORENZO POZ MARIO ed ITALO Via 6 Novembre 170 I-32040 Candide-Comelico Superiore Belluno / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | For all designated states POZ S.n.c. di DE LORENZO POZ MARIO ed ITALO Via 6 Novembre 170 I-32040 Candide-Comelico Superiore Belluno / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
de Lorenzo Poz, Mario Via 6 Novembre 160 I-32040 Candide (Belluno) / IT | [1987/15] | Representative(s) | Notaro, Giancarlo, et al Jacobacci-Casetta & Perani S.p.A. Via Alfieri 17 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | Notaro, Giancarlo, et al c/o Jacobacci-Casetta & Perani S.p.A. Via Alfieri, 17 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 86830276.1 | 01.10.1986 | [1987/15] | Priority number, date | IT19850053881U | 02.10.1985 Original published format: IT 5388185 U | [1987/15] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0217763 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0217763 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G02C5/22 | [1987/15] | CPC: |
G02C5/2254 (EP,US);
G02C5/2209 (EP,US);
G02C2200/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/15] | Title | German: | Scharnier für Brillengestell | [1987/15] | English: | Hinge for spectacle frames | [1987/15] | French: | Charnière pour monture de lunettes | [1987/15] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 01.05.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/45] | 05.06.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.11.1986 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   13.12.1986 | 03.11.1986 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   13.12.1986 | 03.11.1986 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   13.12.1986 | 03.11.1986 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   13.12.1986 | 03.11.1986 | ES   M02   Fee paid on   13.12.1986 | 03.11.1986 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   13.12.1986 | 03.11.1986 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   13.12.1986 | 03.11.1986 | GR   M02   Fee paid on   13.12.1986 | 03.11.1986 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   13.12.1986 | 03.11.1986 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   13.12.1986 | 03.11.1986 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   13.12.1986 | 03.11.1986 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   13.12.1986 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1990 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   19.04.1991 | 31.10.1991 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2497337 (ACKERMAN DUANE S); | [Y]FR1037166 (MANUF OYONNAXIENNE); | [Y]US2671379 (ELORANTA VAITO K); | [A]US3102156 (O'DEA MARTIN J); | [A]FR2305751 (PLASTINAX [FR]); | [A]US4018516 (HIDEAKI TOHYAMA, et al) |