EP0229596 - Method and relevant apparatus for controlling the machining of mechanical pieces in a machine tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.06.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARPOSS SOCIETA' PER AZIONI Via Saliceto 13 40010 Bentivoglio BO / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | For all designated states MARPOSS SOCIETA' PER AZIONI Via Saliceto 13 I-40010 Bentivoglio BO / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pozzetti, Mario via Pavese, 41 I-40141 Bologna / IT | [1987/30] | Representative(s) | Miniucchi, Silvio c/o Marposs S.p.A. Via Saliceto 13 I-40010 Bentivoglio (Bologna) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | Miniucchi, Silvio c/o Marposs S.p.A. Via Saliceto 13 I-40010 Bentivoglio (Bologna) / IT | Application number, filing date | 86830373.6 | 16.12.1986 | [1987/30] | Priority number, date | IT19850003651 | 18.12.1985 Original published format: IT 365185 | [1987/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0229596 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0229596 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q15/06 | [1989/13] | CPC: |
B23Q15/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/30] | G05B19/405 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, SE [1987/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Steuerung des Bearbeitungsprozesses von mechanischen Teilen mit einer Werkzeugmaschine | [1987/30] | English: | Method and relevant apparatus for controlling the machining of mechanical pieces in a machine tool | [1987/30] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour commander la fabrication de pièces mécaniques avec une machine-outil | [1987/30] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/45] | 03.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.03.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1992/32] | 19.03.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1992 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2103500 (TOYODA MACHINE WORKS LTD); | [A]FR2243051 (TOYODA MACHINE WORKS LTD [JP]); | [A]US4455789 (GEHRING HEINZ [DE]); | [A]US4539777 (BROWN BERNARD J [US], et al) |