EP0202206 - Robot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEOS PRODUCTS HB P O Box 68 S-761 00 Norrtälje / SE | [1986/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neumann, Karl-Erik P.O. Box 6 S-760 15 Gräddö / SE | [1986/47] | Representative(s) | Barnieske, Hans Wolfgang c/o H.W. Barnieske Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 25 Turingegatan 26 S-151 21 Södertälje 1 / SE | [1986/47] | Application number, filing date | 86850120.6 | 09.04.1986 | [1986/47] | Priority number, date | SE19850002327 | 10.05.1985 Original published format: SE 8502327 | [1986/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0202206 | Date: | 20.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0202206 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B25J17/02 | [1986/47] | CPC: |
B25J17/0266 (EP,US);
B25J17/0275 (EP,US);
B25J9/0069 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/47] | Title | German: | Roboter | [1986/47] | English: | Robot | [1986/47] | French: | Robot | [1986/47] | Examination procedure | 19.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/29] | 07.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2007/16] | LU | 07.05.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2085399 (SIMUNOVIC SERGIO N); | [Y]GB2088987 (MARCONI CO LTD); | [A]EP0066393 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [Y]GB2143498 (EMI LTD) | Examination | EP0200369 |