EP0224458 - Method and apparatus for adjusting the binding back margins, especially for sew-stitched, wire-stitched and block stitched magazines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Misomex AB Box 6034 S-126 06 Hägersten / SE | [1987/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dillow, Brian Bergmyntargränd 30 S-162 42 Vällingby / SE | [1987/23] | Representative(s) | Avellan-Hultman, Olle Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/23] | Avellan-Hultman, Olle Avellan-Hultman Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 5366 S-102 49 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 86850371.5 | 23.10.1986 | [1987/23] | Priority number, date | SE19850005579 | 26.11.1985 Original published format: SE 8505579 | [1987/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0224458 | Date: | 03.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0224458 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03F9/00, G03F1/04 | [1987/23] | CPC: |
G03F1/90 (EP,US);
G03F9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Einstellung von Buchbindungsrändern, insbesondere für Fadenheftung, Drahtheftung und Blockheftung von Zeitschriften | [1987/23] | English: | Method and apparatus for adjusting the binding back margins, especially for sew-stitched, wire-stitched and block stitched magazines | [1987/23] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'ajustage des marges de reliure en particulier pour le cousage, l'agrafage et la piqûre à plat de magazines | [1987/23] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 18.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 03.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/51] | 04.06.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1991/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.12.1988 | 31.10.1989 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.1989 | 31.10.1990 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No citations. |