EP0265578 - A non-abrasive polish or cleaning composition and process for its preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eriksson, Jan-Olof Midsommarstigen 23 931 52 Skelleftea / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/18] | For all designated states Eriksson, Jan-Olof Midsommarstigen 23 S-931 52 Skelleftea / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/18] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1991/02] |
Former [1988/18] | Fogelberg, Lennart, et al STENHAGEN PATENTBYRA AB Box 4630 S-116 91 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 86850380.6 | 30.10.1986 | [1988/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0265578 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C09G1/04, C23F3/06, C23G1/10 | [1988/18] | CPC: |
C23G1/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/18] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung eines nicht abschleifenden Polier- und Reinigungsmittels und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1988/18] | English: | A non-abrasive polish or cleaning composition and process for its preparation | [1988/18] | French: | Composition non abrasive de polissage ou de nettoyage et procédé de préparation | [1988/18] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/18] | 20.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 23.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/23] | 29.11.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.110(2) in appeal [1991/23] | Appeal following examination | 16.01.1989 | Appeal received No. T0295/89 | 29.03.1989 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.09.1990 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1990/37] | 11.02.1991 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1989 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.1990 | 31.10.1990 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP74104841 ; | [AD]WO8303253 (ERIKSSON JAN O B); | [A]DE1919820 (ALLIED CHEM) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 90, no. 24, 11th June 1979, page 518, abstract no. 194581s, Columbus, Ohio, US; N.I. SHADRINA et al.: "Prevention of metal corrosion in chemical cleanings of thermal power equipment by solutions of a concentrate of low-molecular-weight acids", & ELEKTR. STN. 1979, (4), 64-6 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 83, no. 2, 14th July 1975, page 287, abstract no. 14801n, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-74 104 841 (OKANO YOSHIMASA) 03-10-1974, & JP74104841 A 00000000 |