EP0229006 - Method and apparatus verifying the authenticity of documents associated with a person and the identity of their bearers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states "Centre d'Etude de l'Energie Nucléaire", "C.E.N." Avenue Plasky 144 Schaerbeek B-1040 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/29] | For all designated states "Centre d'Etude de l'Energie Nucléaire", "C.E.N." Avenue Plasky 144 Schaerbeek B-1040 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Musyck, Emile Paul Henri Jules Amerikalaan 28 B-2440 Geel / BE | 02 /
Binard, Luc André Marie Ghislain Boeretang 207 B-2400 Mol / BE | 03 /
Coupe, Bernard Georges Pierre Quai Saint Brice 7 B-7500 Tournai / BE | [1987/29] | Representative(s) | Callewaert, Jean, et al Gevers Rue de Livourne 7 1060 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/29] | Callewaert, Jean, et al GEVERS Patents, Brussels Airport Business Park, Holidaystraat 5 B-1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 86870182.2 | 04.12.1986 | [1987/29] | Priority number, date | LU19850086203 | 11.12.1985 Original published format: LU 86203 | [1987/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0229006 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0229006 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10 | [1987/29] | CPC: |
G07F7/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/347 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (EP,US);
G06Q20/401 (EP,US);
G07F7/1016 (EP,US);
G07F7/1066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Überprüfung der Echtheit von personengebundenen Dokumenten und der Identität ihrer Träger | [1987/29] | English: | Method and apparatus verifying the authenticity of documents associated with a person and the identity of their bearers | [1987/29] | French: | Procédé et appareil vérifiant l'authenticité de documents liés à une personne et l'identité de leurs porteurs | [1987/29] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/10] | 26.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.01.1992 | GR | 29.01.1992 | IT | 29.01.1992 | NL | 29.01.1992 | SE | 29.01.1992 | ES | 10.05.1992 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 29.01.1992 | |
GR | 29.01.1992 | ||
IT | 29.01.1992 | ||
NL | 29.01.1992 | ||
SE | 29.01.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 29.01.1992 | |
IT | 29.01.1992 | ||
NL | 29.01.1992 | ||
SE | 29.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/46] | AT | 29.01.1992 | |
NL | 29.01.1992 | ||
SE | 29.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/37] | NL | 29.01.1992 | |
SE | 29.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/32] | SE | 29.01.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3956615 (ANDERSON THOMAS G, et al); | [A]US4218738 (MATYAS STEPHEN M [US], et al); | [A]EP0030381 (GREY LAB ESTABLISHMENT [LI]); | [X]FR2471632 (ATALLA TECHNOVATIONS [US]); | [A]GB2114791 (GRYNBERG AVIGDOR); | [Y]US4405829 (RIVEST RONALD L [US], et al); | [A]GB2140179 (AMERICAN EXPRESS CO) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 23, no. 11, avril 1981, pages 4990-4993, New York, US; R.F. CANTOR et al.: "Off-line personal verification using a public-key algorithm" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 25, no. 5, octobre 1982, pages 2358-2360, New York, US; R.F. LENNON et al.: "Authentication with stored KP and dynamic PAC" |