EP0194991 - Soil-tilling implement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.1990 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bombardier-Rotax-Wien Produktions- und Vertriebsgesellschaft m.b.H. Donaufelder Strasse 73-79 A-1210 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/38] | For all designated states Bombardier-Rotax-Wien Produktions- und Vertriebsgesellschaft m.b.H. Donaufelder Strasse 73-79 A-1210 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ranner, Dietrich, Dipl.-Ing. Schwaighofen-Egg A-5301 Eugendorf Salzburg / AT | [1986/38] | Representative(s) | Krause, Ernst, et al Krause, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Casati, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing P.O. Box 234 Amerlingstrasse 8 1061 Wien VI / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/38] | Krause, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing., et al Krause, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Casati, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing P.O. Box 234 Amerlingstrasse 8 A-1061 Wien VI / AT | Application number, filing date | 86890023.4 | 07.02.1986 | [1986/38] | Priority number, date | AT19850000374 | 08.02.1985 Original published format: AT 37485 | [1986/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0194991 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0194991 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A01B33/02, A01B33/16, E01H4/02 | [1987/31] | CPC: |
E02F3/78 (EP,US);
A01B33/02 (EP,US);
A01B33/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/38] | A01B33/02, A01B33/16 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1986/38] | Title | German: | Bodenbearbeitungsgerät | [1986/38] | English: | Soil-tilling implement | [1986/38] | French: | Machine pour le travail du sol | [1986/38] | File destroyed: | 21.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 31.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/10] | 19.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 24.11.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/26] | 25.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/26] | Request for further processing for: | 30.01.1989 | Request for further processing filed | 27.01.1989 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.02.1989 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8103353 (LOREAN MFG CO [US]); | [A]US4019268 (WATERMAN DONALD HERBERT); | [A]FR2167881 (RATRAC AG [CH]); | [A]US3915239 (HENDRICHON LUCIEN) |