EP0199715 - Process for manufacturing steel wire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.1988 Database last updated on 24.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Austria Draht Gesellschaft m.b.H. Bahnhofstrasse 2 A-8600 Bruck a.d.Mur / AT | [1986/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siegmund, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Dr.-Karl-Renner-Strasse 37 A-8600 Bruck a.d. Mur / AT | 02 /
Hojas, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Waldgasse 31 A-8605 Kapfenberg / AT | 03 /
Hampejs, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. Schillerstrasse 24 A-8600 Bruck a.d. Mur / AT | 04 /
Eggenreich, Helmut Bahnhofstrasse 7b A-8600 Bruck a.d. Mur / AT | 05 /
Kraushofer, Erwin Urgental 16 A-8600 Bruck a.d. Mur / AT | [1986/44] | Representative(s) | Haffner, Thomas M., et al Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte KG Schottengasse 3a 1014 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/44] | Haffner, Thomas M., Dr., et al Patentanwalt Schottengasse 3a A-1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 86890113.3 | 24.04.1986 | [1986/44] | Priority number, date | AT19850001264 | 26.04.1985 Original published format: AT 126485 | [1986/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0199715 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0199715 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/06 | [1986/44] | CPC: |
C21D8/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1986/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Stahldraht | [1986/44] | English: | Process for manufacturing steel wire | [1986/44] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de fil d'acier | [1986/44] | File destroyed: | 24.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 31.03.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/46] | 27.06.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1579684 ; | [X]DE2050777 ; | [X]GB2088258 ; | [AD]AT32609B ; | [A]DE1003246 ; | [X]JPS57198211 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 46 (C-153)[1191]23. Februar 1983; & JP-A-57 198 211 (SUMITOMO DENKI KOGYO K.K.) (04-12-1982) |