EP0207928 - Fertilizer and method for its preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.1989 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAVECO TECHNOLOGY ASSOCIATES LIMITED 29/30 Fitzroy Square London W1P 5HH / GB | [1987/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kraljevic, Gojko, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Njegoseva 9 YU-11000 Belgrad / YU | [1987/02] | Representative(s) | Kliment, Peter Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Mag.jur. Peter Kliment Singerstrasse 8 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Kliment, Peter Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Mag.jur. Peter Kliment Singerstrasse 8 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1987/02] | Kliment, Peter Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Mag.jur. Peter Kliment Singerstrasse 8 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 86890154.7 | 27.05.1986 | [1987/02] | Priority number, date | AT19850001686 | 04.06.1985 Original published format: AT 168685 | [1987/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0207928 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0207928 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C05D11/00, C05D9/00, C05D3/04 | [1987/02] | CPC: |
C05D3/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C05D3/00, C05D9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/02] | Title | German: | Düngmittel und Verfahren zur Herstellung derselben | [1987/02] | English: | Fertilizer and method for its preparation | [1987/02] | French: | Engrais et sa méthode de préparation | [1987/02] | File destroyed: | 09.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 30.11.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/20] | 27.12.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1989/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2134507 ; | [Y]DE3043292 ; | [A]GB2109212 ; | [A]DE2412602 ; | [Y]SU1047895 ; | [A]SU763310 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 100, Nr. 7, Februar 1984, Seite 503, Zusammenfassung Nr. 50614g, Columbus, Ohio, US; & SU-A-1 047 895 (MELIKISHIVILI, P.G.INSTITUTE OF PHYSICAL AND ORGANIC CHEMISTRY) 15-10-1983 | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, Woche D21, C04, 1. Juli 1981, Sektion Chemie, Zusammenfassung Nr. 37860 D/21, Derwent Publications Ltd, LondonGB; & SU-A-763 310 (AS USSR RARE ELEMEN) 18-09-1980 |