EP0215769 - Device for mounting display panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Esselte Pendaflex Gesellschaft m.b.H. Ferdinandstrasse 4 1021 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | For all designated states Esselte Pendaflex Gesellschaft m.b.H. Ferdinandstrasse 4 A-1021 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1987/13] | For all designated states Tiedemann, Roman Grossmarktstrasse 4 A-1232 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tiedemann, Roman Laxenburgerstrasse 226 A-1232 Wien / AT | [1987/35] |
Former [1987/13] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Weinzinger, Arnulf, et al Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Weinzinger, Arnulf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Riemergasse 14 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 86890233.9 | 19.08.1986 | [1987/13] | Priority number, date | DE19850023986U | 21.08.1985 Original published format: DE 8523986 U | [1987/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0215769 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0215769 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G09F1/10, G09F7/22 | [1987/13] | CPC: |
G09F7/22 (EP);
G09F3/204 (EP);
G09F3/201 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/13] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Anbringung von Ankündigungstafeln | [1987/13] | English: | Device for mounting display panels | [1987/13] | French: | Dispositif pour fixer des panneaux d'affichage | [1987/13] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 24.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.08.1990 | LI | 31.08.1990 | [1991/43] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2787433 (SLAVSKY ROBERT J, et al); | [A]US3333806 (IRVING WOOLF); | [A]DE1511102 (BERGMANN KLAUS); | [A]US4466592 (JANSON KENNETH D [US]) |