EP0216753 - Groomer for cross-country ski slopes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bombardier-Rotax-Wien Produktions- und Vertriebsgesellschaft m.b.H. Donaufelder Strasse 73-79 A-1210 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/14] | For all designated states Bombardier-Rotax-Wien Produktions- und Vertriebsgesellschaft m.b.H. Donaufelder Strasse 73-79 A-1210 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ranner, Dietrich, Dipl.-Ing. in Schwaighofen-Egg A-5301 Eugendorf Salzburg / AT | [1987/14] | Representative(s) | Krause, Ernst, et al Dipl.- Ing. Krause, Ernst Dipl. Ing. Casati, Wilhelm Patentanwälte Amerlingstrasse 8 1061 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/14] | Krause, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing., et al Dipl.- Ing. Krause, Ernst Dipl. Ing. Casati, Wilhelm Patentanwälte Amerlingstrasse 8 A-1061 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 86890261.0 | 19.09.1986 | [1987/14] | Priority number, date | AT19850002775 | 23.09.1985 Original published format: AT 277585 | [1987/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0216753 | Date: | 01.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0216753 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A63C19/10, E01H4/02 | [1988/09] | CPC: |
E01H4/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/08] | A63C19/10, E01H4/02 | ||
Former IPC [1987/14] | E01H4/02 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, SE [1987/14] | Title | German: | Spurgerät für Langlaufloipen | [1987/14] | English: | Groomer for cross-country ski slopes | [1987/14] | French: | Dispositif pour le traçage de pistes de ski de fond | [1987/14] | File destroyed: | 09.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 03.09.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/16] | 25.11.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.09.1988 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2403006 (CRETE GUERIN [FR]); | [A]DE3029221 (BAECHLER ANTON R); | [X]CH636275 (DESPONDS ROGER [CH]) |