EP0205506 - A METHOD OF TRANSFORMING FUNGI WITH A VECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHR. HANSEN'S LABORATORIUM A/S Boge Allé 10-12, Postboks 407 2970 Horsholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | For all designated states CHR. HANSEN'S LABORATORIUM A/S Boge Allé 10-12, Postboks 407 DK-2970 Horsholm / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VON WETTSTEIN, Diter Aasevej 13 DK-3500 Vaerlose / DK | 02 /
VAN HEESWIJCK, Robyn Grabynkevej 13 DK-2700 Bronshoj / DK | 03 /
RONCERO, Maria, Isabel, Gonzalez CI-Enmedio 11-1'-1' 14004 Cordoba / ES | [1992/11] |
Former [1986/52] | 01 /
VON WETTSTEIN, Diter Aasevej 13 DK-3500 Vaerlose / DK | ||
02 /
VAN HEESWIJCK, Robyn Grabynkevej 13 DK-2700 Bronshoj / DK | |||
03 /
RONCERO, Maria, Isabel, Gonzalez Alonso de Borgas No. 10-5-4 14008 Cordoba / ES | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/52] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86900082.8 | 13.12.1985 | [1986/52] | WO1985DK00120 | Priority number, date | DK19840006019 | 14.12.1984 Original published format: DK 601984 | [1986/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8603774 | Date: | 03.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0205506 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0205506 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/80, C12P1/02, // C12R1:785 | [1992/11] | CPC: |
C12N15/80 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/52] | C12N15/00, C12P1/02, // (C12N15/00, C12R1:785) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TRANSFORMATION VON PILZEN MIT EINEM VEKTOR | [1986/52] | English: | A METHOD OF TRANSFORMING FUNGI WITH A VECTOR | [1986/52] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSFORMATION DE CHAMPIGNONS AVEC UN VECTEUR | [1986/52] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.1986 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/04] | 29.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.03.1992 | BE | 11.03.1992 | CH | 11.03.1992 | FR | 11.03.1992 | IT | 11.03.1992 | LI | 11.03.1992 | NL | 11.03.1992 | SE | 11.03.1992 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 11.03.1992 | |
BE | 11.03.1992 | ||
CH | 11.03.1992 | ||
IT | 11.03.1992 | ||
LI | 11.03.1992 | ||
NL | 11.03.1992 | ||
SE | 11.03.1992 | ||
FR | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/10] | AT | 11.03.1992 | |
BE | 11.03.1992 | ||
CH | 11.03.1992 | ||
LI | 11.03.1992 | ||
NL | 11.03.1992 | ||
SE | 11.03.1992 | ||
FR | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | AT | 11.03.1992 | |
BE | 11.03.1992 | ||
CH | 11.03.1992 | ||
LI | 11.03.1992 | ||
NL | 11.03.1992 | ||
SE | 11.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/48] | BE | 11.03.1992 | |
CH | 11.03.1992 | ||
LI | 11.03.1992 | ||
NL | 11.03.1992 | ||
SE | 11.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/47] | CH | 11.03.1992 | |
LI | 11.03.1992 | ||
SE | 11.03.1992 | ||
Former [1992/37] | CH | 11.03.1992 | |
LI | 11.03.1992 | Cited in | International search | US4082613 [ ] (THIRUMALACHAR MANDAYAM J, et al); | EP0099226 [ ] (UNIV ST LOUIS [US]) | [Y] - Journal of Bacteriology, Vol 159, Sept 1984, Linz J. et al., "Differential gene expression during aerobic germination of Mucor racemosus sporangiospores", p 965-972 | [Y] - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci, USA, Vol 80, Feb 1983, Stohland L. et ., "Construktion of a shuttle vector for the filamentous fungus Neurospora crassa". p 1058-1062 | [A] - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci, USA, Vol 79, June 1982, Stahl U et al., "Replication and expression of a bacterial-mitochondrial hybird plasmid in the fungus Podospora anserina p 3641-3645 | Examination | - Chemical abstracts, vol. 102 (1985), abstract n° 161 420b, Carlsberg Res Commun., 1984, 49(7), 691-702 (Eng) |