EP0207163 - APPARATUS FOR READING OPTICAL RECORDING CARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.1994 [1994/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOYOTA, Kiyoshi Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
ISHIDA, Minoru Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1987/02] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86900238.6 | 05.12.1985 | [1987/02] | WO1985JP00669 | Priority number, date | JP19840260398 | 10.12.1984 Original published format: JP 26039884 | [1987/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8603611 | Date: | 19.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0207163 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0207163 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.06.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/015 | [1987/02] | CPC: |
G06K7/10702 (EP,US);
G06K7/015 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/02] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM LESEN OPTISCHER SPEICHERKARTEN | [1987/02] | English: | APPARATUS FOR READING OPTICAL RECORDING CARDS | [1987/02] | French: | APPAREIL DE LECTURE DE CARTES A ENREGISTREMENT OPTIQUE | [1987/02] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.1986 | Translation filed | 08.08.1986 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.1986 | Search fee paid | 08.08.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/07] | 19.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP56114124 ; | [A]US2938962 (KONINS JULIUS A, et al); | [A]EP0061194 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [AP]WO8501818 (DREXLER TECH [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 185 (P-91)[857], 25th November 1981; & JP-A-56 114 124 (FUJITSU K.K.) 08-09-1981, & JP56114124 A 00000000 | International search | [Y]JPS51137426 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) |