EP0244407 - METHOD OF PREPARING A HOSPITAL ROOM OR THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.05.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTD-PRODUKTER I SMALAND AB Box 195 S-572 01 Oskarshamn / SE | [1987/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NILSSON, Agne Trollebergsvägen 3 S-572 00 Oskarshamn / SE | [1987/46] | Representative(s) | Asketorp, Göran Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 793 220 07 Lund / SE | [2008/34] |
Former [1988/46] | Asketorp, Göran P. Asketorp Patent & Juridik AB P.O. Box 1 S-230 10 Skanör / SE | ||
Former [1987/46] | Asketorp, Göran P. Asketorp Patent & Juridik AB V. Rönneholmsvägen 62 S-217 41 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 86900329.3 | 11.12.1985 | [1987/46] | WO1985SE00517 | Priority number, date | SE19840006299 | 12.12.1984 Original published format: SE 8406299 | [1987/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8603539 | Date: | 19.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0244407 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 19.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E04H3/08 | [1987/46] | CPC: |
H02G1/00 (EP);
A61G12/00 (EP);
E04H3/08 (EP);
H02G3/0431 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINRICHTEN EINES SPITALRAUMES ODER DERGLEICHEN | [1987/46] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARING A HOSPITAL ROOM OR THE LIKE | [1987/46] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UNE CHAMBRE D'HOPITAL OU AUTRE | [1987/46] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.1987 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.1986 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 07.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/46] | 17.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.02.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1991/28] | 23.02.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1989 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.1989 | 02.01.1991 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE1784474 [ ]; | DE2103110 [ ]; | SE365841 [ ]; | SE377151 [ ] (SIGFR ANDERSSONS ELEKTRISKA AF [SE]); | FR2318991 [ ] |