EP0204814 - METHOD FOR ELECTRICALLY INTERCONNECTING SOLAR CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.1991 [1991/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL SOLAR ENERGY CORPORATION 4 Suburban Park Drive Billerica Massachusetts 01821 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/51] | For all designated states MOBIL SOLAR ENERGY CORPORATION 4 Suburban Park Drive Billerica, Massachusetts 01821 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIS, John, G. 5 Rio Grande Drive Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | [1986/51] | Representative(s) | Kerr, Simonne June, et al European Patent Attorney POTTS, KERR & CO. P.O. Box 688 Ascot Berkshire SL5 8YT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/51] | Kerr, Simonne June, et al European Patent Attorney POTTS, KERR & CO. P.O. Box 688 Ascot Berkshire SL5 8YT / GB | Application number, filing date | 86900359.0 | 08.11.1985 | [1986/51] | WO1985US02225 | Priority number, date | US19840677877 | 04.12.1984 Original published format: US 677877 | [1986/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8603623 | Date: | 19.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0204814 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0204814 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.06.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/18 | [1986/51] | CPC: |
H01L31/188 (EP,US);
H01L31/0504 (EP,US);
H01L31/1876 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49112 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ELEKTRISCHEN VERBINDEN VON SOLARZELLEN | [1990/33] | English: | METHOD FOR ELECTRICALLY INTERCONNECTING SOLAR CELLS | [1986/51] | French: | PROCEDE D'INTERCONNEXION ELECTRIQUE DE CELLULES SOLAIRES | [1986/51] |
Former [1986/51] | VERFAHREN ZUM ELEKTRISCHEN VERBINDEN VON SOMMERZELLEN | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.1986 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.1986 | Search fee paid | 19.08.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/07] | 07.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2757301 (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG); | [A]US4219926 (BLOCH JOSEPH T [US], et al); | [A]US4348546 (LITTLE ROGER G); | [A]EP0095843 (AMP INC [US]) | International search | [Y]US3819417 (HAYNOS J); | [YP]US4534502 (PIUREK WALTER J [US]) |