EP0203178 - MULTIPLE PURPOSE ANIMAL EAR TAG SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.1991 [1991/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hayes, Norman Jay 36 Road 2 ABN Cody, WY 82414 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states Hayes, Norman Jay 36 Road 2 ABN Cody, WY 82414 / US | ||
Former [1986/49] | For all designated states Hayes, Norman Jay 36 Road 2 ABN Cody, WY 82414 / US | ||
For all designated states SHAW, Richard J. 13525 West Keefe Avenue Brookfield, WI 53005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayes, Norman J. 36 Road 2, ABN Cody, Wyoming 82414 / US | 02 /
Shaw, Richard J. 13525 West Keefe Avenue Brookfield, Wisconsin 53005 / US | [1989/19] |
Former [1986/49] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/05] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/49] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86900379.8 | 26.11.1985 | [1986/49] | WO1985US02322 | Priority number, date | US19840675529 | 28.11.1984 Original published format: US 675529 | [1986/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8603096 | Date: | 05.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0203178 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.06.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A01K11/00, G09F3/06 | [1987/25] | CPC: |
A01K11/004 (EP,US);
A01K11/006 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/49] | A01K13/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/27] |
Former [1986/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | MEHRZWECKETIKETTENSYSTEM FÜR TIEROHREN | [1986/49] | English: | MULTIPLE PURPOSE ANIMAL EAR TAG SYSTEM | [1986/49] | French: | BOUTON DE MARQUAGE AURICULAIRE POLYVALENT | [1986/49] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.1986 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.1986 | Search fee paid | 22.08.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.1986 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/05] | 19.12.1986 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, LU, SE | 07.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/29] | 15.02.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1991/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.08.1986 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 25.08.1986 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 25.08.1986 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 25.08.1986 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.1987 | 01.12.1988 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.1988 | 30.11.1990 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3952438 (PROPST ROBERT L, et al); | [X]US4184453 (RITCHEY EUGENE B [US]); | [A]US4359015 (RITCHEY EUGENE B) | International search | US2832161 [ ] (MURPHY JOHN A); | US3956840 [ ] (MELIN JOHN E); | US3958353 [ ] (HAYES NORMAN J); | FR2316676 [ ] (HERODET JEAN [FR]); | US4317990 [ ] (ZMOKLY TADEUSZ, et al); | US4428327 [ ] (STECKEL LESTER M [US]) |