EP0205572 - STRUCTURE, USE AND MANUFACTURE OF FASTENERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.1991 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dennison Manufacturing Company 300 Howard Street Framingham, MA 01701 / US | [1986/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONE, Arnold, R. 25 Bradford Street Needham, MA 02192 / US | [1986/52] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Anthony John Metcalf, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | Robinson, Anthony John Metcalf, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London, WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 86900479.6 | 10.12.1985 | [1986/52] | WO1985US02447 | Priority number, date | US19840679737 | 10.12.1984 Original published format: US 679737 | [1986/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8603385 | Date: | 19.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0205572 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.06.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A44B9/00, B65D85/24, B23P19/02 | [1986/52] | CPC: |
A41H37/10 (EP,US);
A44B9/00 (KR);
A41F1/00 (EP,US);
Y10T24/4691 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/52] | Title | German: | STRUKTUR, VERWENDUNG UND HERSTELLUNG VON KLEMMEN | [1986/52] | English: | STRUCTURE, USE AND MANUFACTURE OF FASTENERS | [1986/52] | French: | STRUCTURE, UTILISATION ET FABRICATION D'ATTACHES | [1986/52] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.1986 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.1986 | Search fee paid | 19.08.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/06] | 25.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/42] | 08.02.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1578318 | International search | US1983558 [ ] (MORIN LOUIS H, et al); | US2825162 [ ] (FLOOD CARL A); | US3103666 [ ] (BONE ARNOLD R); | US3399432 [ ] (MERSER FRANCIS G); | US3470834 [ ] (BONE ARNOLD R); | US3571885 [ ] (MCGRATH JOHN L); | US3765110 [ ] (OLSEN R); | US3850297 [ ] (MERSER F); | US3875648 [ ] (BONE ARNOLD R); | US4215807 [ ] (PATTERSON EDWIN A [US], et al); | US4315587 [ ] (RITTER DON D, et al); | US4347932 [ ] (FURUTU AKIRA); | US4417656 [ ] (KATO MASAMI [JP]); | US4536933 [ ] (FURUTSU AKIRA [JP]); | JPH115288 [ ] (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) |