EP0203192 - INNER SOLE FOR SHOES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.1990 [1990/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Popp, Eugen Wildenwarterstrasse 20 D-8000 München 82 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/49] | For all designated states POPP, Eugen Wildenwarterstrasse 20 D-8000 München 82 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/49] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/49] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86900654.4 | 03.12.1985 | [1986/49] | WO1985EP00659 | Priority number, date | DE19843444040 | 03.12.1984 Original published format: DE 3444040 | [1986/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8603384 | Date: | 19.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0203192 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0203192 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A43B17/04 | [1986/49] | CPC: |
A43B17/04 (EP);
A43B1/0054 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1986/49] | Title | German: | EINLEGESOHLE FÜR SCHUHE | [1986/49] | English: | INNER SOLE FOR SHOES | [1986/49] | French: | SEMELLE INTERIEURE POUR CHAUSSURES | [1986/49] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.1986 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/10] | 13.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 16.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 04.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE8304272U [ ]; | CH291168 [ ] (BIRKENSTOCK HEINRICH [DE]); | DE8415720U [ ] |