EP0259299 - PARTIAL DYEING OF YARNS IN WOUND FORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.1988 [1988/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scatizzi, Mario Via San Quirino, 25 I-51100 Pistoia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/11] | For all designated states SCATIZZI, Mario Via San Quirino, 25 I-51100 Pistoia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/11] | Application number, filing date | 86900834.2 | 23.01.1986 | [1988/11] | WO1986IT00005 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8704473 | Date: | 30.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0259299 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D06B11/00 | [1988/11] | CPC: |
D06B11/0013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/11] | Title | German: | TEILWEISES FÄRBEN VON GARN IN AUFGEWICKELTER FORM | [1988/11] | English: | PARTIAL DYEING OF YARNS IN WOUND FORM | [1988/11] | French: | TEINTURE PARTIELLE DE FILS ENROULES | [1988/11] | File destroyed: | 24.08.1994 | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/30] | 15.02.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1988/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.10.1987 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 23.10.1987 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 23.10.1987 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 23.10.1987 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 23.10.1987 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 23.10.1987 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 23.10.1987 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 23.10.1987 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 23.10.1987 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0038210 [ ]; | FR1562153 [ ] |