EP0213157 - CONCENTRATION OF SOLIDS IN A SUSPENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEMTEC LIMITED 1, Memtec Parkway South Windsor, New South Wales 2756 / AU | [1992/16] |
Former [1987/11] | For all designated states MEMTEC LIMITED 60 Macquarie Street Parramatta, NSW 2150 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORD, Douglas, Lyons 17 Trelawney Street Eastwood, NSW 2122 / AU | 02 /
ANDERSON, Eric, William 10 Cox Crescent Dundas, NSW 2117 / AU | 03 /
KOPP, Clinton, Virgil 3 Noble Place Castle Hill, NSW 2154 / AU | [1987/11] | Representative(s) | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/04] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | ||
Former [1987/11] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London, EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 86901312.8 | 03.03.1986 | [1987/11] | WO1986AU00049 | Priority number, date | AU19850009572 | 05.03.1985 Original published format: AU 957285 | AU19850009692 | 13.03.1985 Original published format: AU 969285 | AU19850003355 | 11.11.1985 Original published format: AU 335585 | [1987/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8605116 | Date: | 12.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0213157 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0213157 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 12.09.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/00, B01D63/02 | [1992/44] | CPC: |
B01D63/02 (EP,US);
B01D61/18 (EP,US);
B01D65/02 (EP,US);
B01D69/02 (EP,US);
B01D2313/48 (EP,US);
B01D2321/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/11] | B01D13/00, B01D13/01 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/11] | Title | German: | KONZENTRIERUNG VON FESTSTOFFEN IN EINER SUSPENSION | [1987/11] | English: | CONCENTRATION OF SOLIDS IN A SUSPENSION | [1987/11] | French: | CONCENTRATION DE SOLIDES DANS UNE SUSPENSION | [1987/11] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.1986 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.1986 | Search fee paid | 24.10.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/11] | 04.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | BE CH DE FR GB NL | Licencee: | Memtec Europe Limited Units 37/38 Halifax Road The Metropolitan Centre Greenford Middlesex / GB | Date: | 02.08.1989 | ID: | 02 00/not-exclusive | For: | AT IT SE | Licencee: | Memtec Europe Limited Units 37/38 Halifax Road The Metropolitan Centre Greenford Middlesex / GB | Date: | 02.08.1989 |
Former [1989/38] | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | |
For: | BE CH DE FR GB NL | ||
Licencee: | Memtec Europe Limited Units 37/38 Halifax Road The Metropolitan Centre Greenford Middlesex / GB | ||
Date: | |||
ID: | 02 00/not-exclusive | ||
For: | AT IT SE | ||
Licencee: | Memtec Europe Limited Units 37/38 Halifax Road The Metropolitan Centre Greenford Middlesex / GB | ||
Date: | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.10.1992 | CH | 28.10.1992 | LI | 28.10.1992 | SE | 28.10.1992 | [1994/18] |
Former [1993/19] | CH | 28.10.1992 | |
LI | 28.10.1992 | ||
SE | 28.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | CH | 28.10.1992 | |
LI | 28.10.1992 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH05624006 ; | [X]US3912624 (JENNINGS JAMES L); | [X]US3992301 (SHIPPEY FRANK R, et al); | [X]GB1535832 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [XP]AU3440084 (MEMTEC LTD); | [X]JPS60137404 (SANKYO SEIKI SEISAKUSHO KK); | [X]JPH0622906 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [X]JPH0632897 (SHELL INT RESEARCH); | [X]JPH0644088 (TOSHIBA CORP) | Examination | EP0160014 |