EP0211931 - A SLUICE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1990 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.04.1990 [1990/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALFASTAR AB Box 500 S-147 00 Tumba / SE | [1987/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STENSTRÖM, Lennart Daggstigen 22 S-141 38 Huddinge / SE | 02 /
WAHLSTRÖM, Lennart Blockvägen 13 S-147 00 Tumba / SE | 03 /
MALMGREN, Torsten Stubbkärrsvägen 5 S-141 42 Huddinge / SE | [1987/10] | Representative(s) | Graudums, Valdis Albihn West AB Stora Nygatan 15 S-411 08 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | Graudums, Valdis Albihn West AB Stora Nygatan 15 S-411 08 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 86901557.8 | 14.02.1986 | [1987/10] | WO1986SE00063 | Priority number, date | SE19850000754 | 18.02.1985 Original published format: SE 8500754 | [1987/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8604832 | Date: | 28.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0211931 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0211931 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B01J3/02, A23L3/04 | [1987/10] | CPC: |
B01J3/02 (EP,US);
A23L3/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/10] | Title | German: | SCHLEUSENANORDNUNG | [1987/10] | English: | A SLUICE DEVICE | [1987/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ECLUSAGE | [1987/10] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.1986 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/10] | 28.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | NO122406B [ ] (MAX BEAUVAIS [FR], et al); | SU601039 [ ] (VNII ELEK SELSKOGO KHOZ [SU]); | US4413977 [ ] (TAKANO MOTOHARU [JP], et al) | [X] - "Derwent's abstract No. 15184 B/08, SU 601 039". |