EP0250416 - METHOD FOR JOINING TOGETHER STEARINE CANDLE HALVES AND A DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.1988 [1988/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDQVIST, Dan Malmgardsvägen 21 S-691 36 Karlskoga / SE | For all designated states OLSSON, Mats Rabäck 1330 265 00 Atorp / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | For all designated states NORDQVIST, Dan Malmgardsvägen 21 S-691 36 Karlskoga / SE | ||
For all designated states OLSSON, Mats Rabäck 1330 S-265 00 Atorp / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/01] | Application number, filing date | 86901569.3 | 20.02.1986 | [1988/01] | WO1986SE00076 | Priority number, date | SE19850000795 | 20.02.1985 Original published format: SE 8500795 | [1988/01] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8604918 | Date: | 28.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0250416 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C11C5/00 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
C11C5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBINDUNG ZWEIER STEARINKERZENHÄLFTEN UND DURCHFÜHRUNG | [1988/01] | English: | METHOD FOR JOINING TOGETHER STEARINE CANDLE HALVES AND A DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD | [1988/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ASSEMBLAGE DE MOITIES DE BOUGIES EN STEARINE | [1988/01] | File destroyed: | 24.08.1994 | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.1986 | Translation filed | Examination procedure | 19.09.1986 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 21.08.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/28] | 22.12.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.09.1987 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 21.09.1987 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 21.09.1987 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 21.09.1987 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 21.09.1987 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 21.09.1987 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 21.09.1987 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 21.09.1987 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 21.09.1987 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 21.09.1987 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.08.1987 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ ] - No relevant documents have been disclosed |