EP0211937 - APPARATUS FOR REGULATING THE FLOW OF FLUID IN MEDICAL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOMEDICAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION 11921 Portland Avenue Burnsville, MN 55337 / US | [1987/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARINO, Joseph, A., Jr. 13950 Pennock Avenue Apple Valley, MN 55124 / US | 02 /
BELLIN, Matthew, E. 11002 Radisson Drive Burnsville, MN 55337 / US | [1987/10] | Representative(s) | Arthur, George Fitzgerald, et al KILBURN & STRODE 30, John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | [1987/10] | Application number, filing date | 86901591.7 | 10.02.1986 | [1987/10] | WO1986US00268 | Priority number, date | US19850702991 | 19.02.1985 Original published format: US 702991 | [1987/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8604821 | Date: | 28.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0211937 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.08.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/14 | [1987/10] | CPC: |
A61M5/16881 (EP,US);
F16K47/06 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0073 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/10] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR REGELUNG DES FLUSSES EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT IN MEDIZINISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [1987/10] | English: | APPARATUS FOR REGULATING THE FLOW OF FLUID IN MEDICAL APPARATUS | [1987/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION DU DEBIT D'UN LIQUIDE DANS UN APPAREIL MEDICAL | [1987/10] | File destroyed: | 24.08.1994 | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.1986 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.1986 | Search fee paid | 27.10.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/10] | 03.10.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No relevant documents have been disclosed. | International search | [X]FR1126735 ; | [Y]US3069126 (RANDALL ROSS D); | [Y]US1723066 (OGDEN ALBERT U); | [Y]US3841354 (MCDONNELL R); | [Y]US4079737 (MILLER JOHN J); | [Y]US2698160 (HANSEN GEORGE E); | [A]US4027669 (JOHNSTON DONALD LEROY, et al); | [A]US4240424 (AKHAVI DAVID S [US]) |