EP0215069 - POLYSILOXANE RESIST FOR ION BEAM AND ELECTRON BEAM LITHOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.1992 [1992/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | ||
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O.Box 45066 Los Angeles California 90045-0066 / US | ||
Former [1987/13] | For all designated states HUGHES AIRCRAFT COMPANY 7200 Hughes Terrace Los Angeles, California 90502 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAULT, Robert, G. 924 Princeton Street Santa Monica, CA 90403 / US | [1987/13] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 86901713.7 | 28.02.1986 | [1987/13] | WO1986US00425 | Priority number, date | US19850709019 | 07.03.1985 Original published format: US 709019 | [1987/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8605284 | Date: | 12.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0215069 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0215069 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/075, G03F7/09 | [1991/15] | CPC: |
G03F7/0757 (EP,US);
G03F7/004 (KR);
G03F7/094 (EP,US);
G03F7/075 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1987/13] | G03F7/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/13] | Title | German: | POLYSILOXANSCHUTZLACK FÜR IONEN- UND ELEKTRONENSTRAHL-LITHOGRAPHIE | [1987/13] | English: | POLYSILOXANE RESIST FOR ION BEAM AND ELECTRON BEAM LITHOGRAPHY | [1987/13] | French: | COUCHE DE PROTECTION EN POLYSILOXANE POUR LITHOGRAPHIE A FAISCEAU D'IONS OU D'ELECTRONS | [1987/13] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.1986 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/13] | 22.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS57141642 ; | [A]JPS57141641 ; | [Y]EP0049127 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP0076656 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]); | [XP]EP0163538 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [XP]EP0167854 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) | [Y] - International Polymer Science & Technology, Volume 8, No. 9, 1981, Shurasbyry, (GB) T.S. VASILEVA et al.: "Influence of the Condition of Contineous Hydrolysis of Methyltrichlorosilane on the Compostion of the Reaction Products", see page T51, column 2, lines 2-15; page T52, formula's | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821203), vol. 006, no. 245, Database accession no. (P - 159)<1123> , & JP57141642 A 19820902 (FUJITSU) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821203), vol. 006, no. 245, Database accession no. (P - 159)<1123> , & JP57141641 A 19820902 (FUJITSU) | Examination | EP0122398 |