EP0252086 - A HYDRAULIC LIFTING TABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/02] | DEVICE AT A HYDRAULIC LIFTING TABLE | ||
[1989/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.1990 [1990/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYMO AB Box 187 S-616 00 Aby / SE | [1988/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSSON, Lars Perstorpsvägen 11 S-616 00 Aby / SE | [1988/02] | Representative(s) | Willquist, Bo Lorentz Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | Willquist, Bo Lorentz PATS Willquist Patents S:t Larsgatan 23 S-582 24 Linköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 86902568.4 | 09.04.1986 | [1988/02] | WO1986SE00165 | Priority number, date | SE19850001852 | 16.04.1985 Original published format: SE 8501852 | [1988/02] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8606054 | Date: | 23.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0252086 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0252086 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B66F7/08, B66F3/22 | [1988/02] | CPC: |
B66F7/065 (EP,US);
B66F7/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/02] | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHE HEBEBÜHNE | [1989/29] | English: | A HYDRAULIC LIFTING TABLE | [1989/29] | French: | UNE TABLE HYDRAULIQUE DE LEVAGE | [1989/29] |
Former [1988/02] | VORRICHTUNG AN EINER HYDRAULISCHEN HEBEBÜHNE | ||
Former [1988/02] | DEVICE AT A HYDRAULIC LIFTING TABLE | ||
Former [1988/02] | DISPOSITIF POUR UNE TABLE HYDRAULIQUE DE LEVAGE | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.1987 | Translation filed | 25.09.1987 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.1986 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 25.09.1987 | Examination requested [1988/09] | 03.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB846161 (TIPTON WELDED FABRICATIONS LTD); | [A]DE1207061 (VER FLUGTECHNISCHE WERKE); | [A]DE2253765 (COIGNET CONSTRUCT EDMOND); | [A]SE418727 (PETTERSSON KJELL GUSTAF); | [A]FI60841B (KONSULTTITOIMISTO LOGMA REINO [FI]); | [A]DE3248414 (NUSSBAUM OTTO GMBH CO KG [DE]) |