EP0225336 - CONNECTOR RECEIVING SHROUD FOR PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.08.1989 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/25] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OWENS, Steven, Parks 24 Harrise Drive Harrisburg, PA 17112 / US | [1987/25] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | ||
Former [1987/25] | Gray, Robin Oliver BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 86902707.8 | 10.04.1986 | [1987/25] | WO1986US00752 | Priority number, date | US19850736191 | 20.05.1985 Original published format: US 736191 | [1987/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8607203 | Date: | 04.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0225336 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/516, H01R13/74, H01R13/658 | [1987/25] | CPC: |
H01R13/516 (EP,KR);
H01R13/6583 (EP);
H01R13/6596 (EP);
H01R13/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/25] | Title | German: | EINEN VERBINDER AUFNEHMENDER RAHMEN FÜR EINE PLATTE | [1987/25] | English: | CONNECTOR RECEIVING SHROUD FOR PANEL | [1987/25] | French: | ELEMENT D'ENBOITEMENT RECEVANT DES CONNECTEURS POUR PANNEAU | [1987/25] | File destroyed: | 21.07.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.1987 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/25] | 28.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.05.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1989/42] | 29.05.1989 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1989/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1989 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0004422 [ ] (AMP INC [US]); | US3685001 [ ] (KRAFTHEFER KERRY M); | EP0073112 [ ] (AMP INC [US]) |