EP0221941 - CHIMNEY CAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 13.08.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1991 | Opposition rejected | published on 02.10.1991 [1991/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVENTINA AG Prättigauerstrasse CH-7302 Landquart / CH | [1987/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASTEN, Gert Rebhaldenweg 2 CH-7206 Igis / CH | [1987/21] | Representative(s) | Werffeli, Heinz Ralph Postfach 275 Waldgartenstrasse 12 8125 Zollikerberg-Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | Werffeli, Heinz R., Dipl.-Ing.ETH. Postfach 275 Waldgartenstrasse 12 CH-8125 Zürich-Zollikerberg / CH | ||
Former [1987/21] | Hefel, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Egelseestrasse 65a Postfach 61 A-6800 Feldkirch / AT | Application number, filing date | 86902832.4 | 10.05.1986 | [1987/21] | WO1986EP00272 | Priority number, date | AT19850001451 | 14.05.1985 Original published format: AT 145185 | [1987/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8606818 | Date: | 20.11.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0221941 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0221941 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F23L17/02 | [1987/21] | CPC: |
F23L17/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [1987/21] | Title | German: | SCHORNSTEINAUFSATZ | [1987/21] | English: | CHIMNEY CAP | [1987/21] | French: | HOTTE | [1987/21] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.1987 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/29] | 17.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.08.1989
25.08.1989
ADMISSIBLE STRABIT-Werke GmbH Gladbacher Feld D-5450 Neuwied 1 / DE Opponent's representative Sperling, Rüdiger, et al, et al Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Sonnenstrasse 19 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.08.1989
25.08.1989
ADMISSIBLE STRABIT-Werke GmbH Gladbacher Feld D-5450 Neuwied 1 / DE Opponent's representative Sperling, Rüdiger, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. S. Staeger, Dipl.Ing.Dipl.Wirtsch.Ing. R. Sperling, Müllerstrasse 31 D-80469 München / DE | 05.09.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.05.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.04.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.04.1991 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.05.1991 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 18.05.1991 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1991/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR1390476 [ ]; | DE3237216 [ ]; | DE3317366 [ ] |