EP0220257 - CRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.1988 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PORTAPAX LIMITED 21 Maesglas Industrial Estate Newport, Gwent NP9 2NN / GB | [1987/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENORN, Evelyn 29, boulevard de Helvetique CH-1207 Geneva / CH | [1987/19] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | Whalley, Kevin, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | ||
Former [1987/19] | Whalley, Kevin MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 86902855.5 | 25.04.1986 | [1987/19] | WO1986GB00225 | Priority number, date | GB19850010582 | 25.04.1985 Original published format: GB 8510582 | [1987/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8606348 | Date: | 06.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0220257 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/22, B65D1/36, A01G9/02 | [1987/19] | CPC: |
A01G9/028 (EP);
B65D1/225 (EP);
B65D1/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/19] | Title | German: | KISTE | [1987/19] | English: | CRATE | [1987/19] | French: | CAISSE A CLAIRE-VOIE | [1987/19] | File destroyed: | 24.08.1994 | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.1987 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/25] | 21.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/01] | 02.08.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE2502417 [ ]; | NL7713224 [ ]; | CH598082 [ ]; | GB2163132 [ ] |