EP0221152 - KEY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.1987 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.1987 [1987/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PETERS, Gilbert A. 1608 Lake Hill Lane Plano, TX 75023 / US | For all designated states MITCHELL, J. Brooks 1805 Lakeshore Lane Plano, TX 75023 / US | [1987/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/20] | Application number, filing date | 86903065.0 | 25.04.1986 | [1987/20] | WO1986US00918 | Priority number, date | US19850733224 | 10.05.1985 Original published format: US 733224 | [1987/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8606858 | Date: | 20.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0221152 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/14 | [1987/20] | CPC: |
G07C9/00896 (EP,US);
G07C9/27 (EP,US);
G08B5/22 (EP,US);
G08B5/36 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00936 (EP,US);
Y10T70/8676 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/20] | Title | German: | SCHLÜSSELVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [1987/20] | English: | KEY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [1987/20] | French: | SYSTEME DE GESTION DE CLEFS | [1987/20] | File destroyed: | 05.07.1993 | Examination procedure | 14.04.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/47] | 03.06.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1987/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.02.1987 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 12.02.1987 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 12.02.1987 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 12.02.1987 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 12.02.1987 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 12.02.1987 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 12.02.1987 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 12.02.1987 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 12.02.1987 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 12.02.1987 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.05.1987 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2146154 (BANKS EDWARD JOHN KENNETH, et al); | [XP]US4549170 (SERRES BERNARD M [FR], et al); | [A]US4205328 (GOTANDA MOTOHIRO [JP]) |