EP0221158 - MODULAR CONNECTOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1990 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.01.1991 [1991/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | ||
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | ||
Former [1989/29] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) 470 Friendship Road P.O. Box 3608 Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | ||
Former [1987/20] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURMAN, Lev, B. 254 East Fern Avenue /102 Redland CA 92373 / US | [1990/05] |
Former [1987/20] | 01 /
FURMAN, Lev, B. 221 South Keesey Street York, PA 17402 / US | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/29] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | ||
Former [1987/20] | Gray, Robin Oliver BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 86903079.1 | 30.04.1986 | [1987/20] | WO1986US00941 | Priority number, date | US19850729102 | 30.04.1985 Original published format: US 729102 | US19850729103 | 30.04.1985 Original published format: US 729103 | US19850729104 | 30.04.1985 Original published format: US 729104 | US19860853306 | 17.04.1986 Original published format: US 853306 | [1987/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8606556 | Date: | 06.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0221158 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0221158 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/516 | [1987/20] | CPC: |
H01R13/514 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/42] |
Former [1987/20] | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | Title | German: | MODULARES VERBINDUNGSSYSTEM | [1987/20] | English: | MODULAR CONNECTOR SYSTEM | [1987/20] | French: | SYSTEME DE CONNECTEURS MODULAIRES | [1987/20] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.1986 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/20] | 01.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0070392 [ ]; | AU446128B [ ]; | US4448471 [ ]; | US3993394 [ ]; | DE2313437 [ ]; | US3994555 [ ]; | EP0123590 [ ]; | FR1323749 [ ]; | CH330621 [ ] |