EP0220288 - PERITONEAL DIALYSIS CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 10.01.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1996 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 21.02.1996 [1996/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CURATORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MISSOURI 316 University Hall Columbia, MO 65211 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | For all designated states THE CURATORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MISSOURI 227 University Hall Columbia Missouri 65211 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TWARDOWSKI, Zbylut, J. 304 Devine Court Columbia, MO 65203 / US | 02 /
NOLPH, Karl, D. 908 Hickory Hill Drive Columbia, MO 65203 / US | 03 /
KHANNA, Ramesh 2514 Ridgefield Road Columbia, MO 65203 / US | [1987/19] | Representative(s) | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/19] | MacGregor, Gordon ERIC POTTER CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham, NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 86903088.2 | 30.04.1986 | [1987/19] | WO1986US00957 | Priority number, date | US19850729185 | 01.05.1985 Original published format: US 729185 | US19860826823 | 06.02.1986 Original published format: US 826823 | [1987/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8606282 | Date: | 06.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0220288 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0220288 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.11.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [1987/19] | CPC: |
A61M1/285 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0293 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/19] | Title | German: | KATHETER FÜR DIE PERITONEALDIALYSE | [1987/19] | English: | PERITONEAL DIALYSIS CATHETER | [1987/19] | French: | CATHETER POUR DIALYSE PERITONEALE | [1987/19] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.1986 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.1986 | Search fee paid | 18.12.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/19] | 17.04.1987 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 03.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 24.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.06.1994
21.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE Sil-Med Corporation 700 Warner Boulevard Taunton, MA. 02780, USA / US Opponent's representative Körner, Ekkehard (DE) Kroher - Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 D-80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.06.1994
21.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE Sil-Med Corporation 700 Warner Boulevard Taunton, MA. 02780, USA / US Opponent's representative Körner, Ekkehard (DE) Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Ekkehard Körner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.06.1994
Sil-Med Corporation 700 Warner Boulevard Taunton, MA. 02780, USA / US Opponent's representative Boberg, Nils Gunnar Erik Gambro AB Patent Department Box 10101 S-220 10 Lund / SE | 21.07.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.01.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 06.10.1995 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1996/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1990 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   21.06.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0081724 (FRESENIUS AG [DE]) | International search | [Y]EP0081724 (FRESENIUS AG [DE]); | [Y]US4392855 (OREOPOULOS DIMITRIOS G [CA], et al); | [Y]US4437856 (VALLI ALBERTO [IT]); | [Y]US4491126 (CULLOR JAMES S [US]); | [Y]US4496349 (COSENTINO LOUIS C [US]) |