EP0224532 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING GAMMA-GLOBULINS SUPPLIED BY INTRAVENOUS ADMINISTRATION AND GAMMA-GLOBULINS OBTAINED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.03.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PASTEUR MERIEUX SERUMS ET VACCINS 58, avenue Leclerc 69007 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | For all designated states PASTEUR MERIEUX SERUMS ET VACCINS 58, avenue Leclerc F-69007 Lyon / FR | ||
Former [1987/24] | For all designated states INSTITUT MERIEUX 17, rue Bourgelat F-69002 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAKULA, Marie-France La Cerisaie 18D, rue de Tourvielle F-69005 Lyon / FR | 02 /
LIAUTAUD, Jacques Le Petit Paris F-69760 Limonest / FR | [1987/24] | Representative(s) | Lemoine, Michel, et al Cabinet Bernasconi et Vigier 13 boulevard des Batignolles F-75008 Paris / FR | [1987/24] | Application number, filing date | 86903414.0 | 30.05.1986 | [1987/24] | WO1986FR00184 | Priority number, date | FR19850008094 | 30.05.1985 Original published format: FR 8508094 | [1987/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8606963 | Date: | 04.12.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0224532 | Date: | 10.06.1987 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395 | [1987/24] | CPC: |
C07K16/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON INTRAVENÖS ZU VERABREICHENDEN GAMMA-GLOBULINEN UND SO ERHALTENE GAMMA-GLOBULINE | [1987/24] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING GAMMA-GLOBULINS SUPPLIED BY INTRAVENOUS ADMINISTRATION AND GAMMA-GLOBULINS OBTAINED | [1987/24] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE GAMMA-GLOBULINES ADMINISTREES PAR VOIE INTRAVEINEUSE ET GAMMA-GLOBULINES OBTENUES | [1987/24] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 31.12.1986 | National basic fee paid | 31.12.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.12.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.12.1986 | Examination requested [1988/39] | 19.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/18] | 11.12.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR2301266 [ ] (COVAL M L [US]); | FR2433342 [ ] (BLUTSPENDEDIENST LANDESVERBAND [DE]); | EP0120835 [ ] (IMMUNO AG [AT]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol.81, No.23, 09 December 1974, Columbus, Ohio (US) J.J.WALSH: 'Purfication of Normal Immunoglobulin for Intravenous use' see page 363, ref. No. 149961u, & Develop. Biol. Stand. 1974,27,31-6 cited in the application | [X] - Experientia, Vol.39, No.5, May 1983, Birkhauser Verlag, Basel (CH) B.FAVREAU et al.: 'A new method for the Large Scale Preparation of Antitoxic Antibodies Exhibiting High Specific Protective Activeties', pages 483-487, see the whole document |