EP0261119 - EXPLOSIVE CUTTING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.1992 [1992/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXPLOSIVE DEVELOPMENTS LIMITED Steeton Hall Whitecote Lane South Milford Leeds, LS25 5LA / GB | [1992/25] |
Former [1988/13] | For all designated states EXPLOSIVE DEVELOPMENTS LIMITED The Aerodrome Melbourne, York YO4 4NF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALFORD, Sidney, Christopher 41A Pickwick Corsham Wiltshire SN13 OHX / GB | 02 /
SHANN, Peter, Christian Delwood Croft Fenwicks Lane Fulford, York Y01 4PL / GB | [1988/13] | Representative(s) | Oulton, Richard John R.J. OULTON & CO., First Floor, Pearl Assurance Buildings, Land of Green Ginger Hull Humberside HU1 2EA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | Oulton, Richard John R.J. OULTON & CO., First Floor, Pearl Assurance Buildings, Land of Green Ginger Hull, Humberside HU1 2EA / GB | Application number, filing date | 86903480.1 | 27.05.1986 | [1988/13] | WO1986GB00292 | Priority number, date | GB19850013325 | 28.05.1985 Original published format: GB 8513325 | [1988/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8607000 | Date: | 04.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0261119 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0261119 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B26F3/04, F42B1/00, B21D28/00 | [1988/13] | CPC: |
F42B1/00 (EP);
B26F3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1988/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHNEIDEN MIT SPRENGSTOFFEN | [1988/13] | English: | EXPLOSIVE CUTTING MEANS | [1988/13] | French: | ORGANE DE COUPE PAR EXPLOSION | [1988/13] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.1987 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.1986 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 25.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/13] | 14.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.07.1988 | 31.05.1989 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.09.1989 | 31.05.1991 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   16.08.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 27.11.1991 | [1992/33] | Cited in | International search | FR1215794 [ ] (ALGERIENNE D EXPLOSIFS ET D AC); | US3076408 [ ] (POULTER THOMAS C, et al); | US3435763 [ ] (LAVINE ARTHUR A); | EP0043215 [ ] (ALFLEX LTD [GB]); | DE2832246 [ ] (DIEHL GMBH & CO [DE]) |