EP0227837 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TAKING UP ELONGATED MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.1991 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.1991 [1991/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | ||
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1987/28] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIO, Masanobu Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554 / JP | 02 /
SAWADA, Kazuo Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric industries, Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554 / JP | 03 /
YAMAUCHI, Kazuhisa Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIMURA, Saburo Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554 / JP | [1990/46] |
Former [1987/28] | 01 /
NISHIO, Masanobu Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554 / JP | ||
02 /
SAWADA, Kazuo Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric industries, Ltd. 1-3, Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMAUCHI, Kazuhisa Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554 / JP | |||
04 /
Yoshimura, Saburo Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554 / JP | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Kirschner & Grosse Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/28] | Patentanwälte Kirschner & Grosse Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86903613.7 | 24.06.1986 | [1987/28] | WO1986JP00318 | Priority number, date | JP19850139718 | 26.06.1985 Original published format: JP 13971885 | [1987/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8700155 | Date: | 15.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0227837 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0227837 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.01.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65H65/00 | [1987/28] | CPC: |
B22D11/005 (EP,US);
B22D11/0611 (EP,US);
B22D11/062 (EP,US);
B22D11/0694 (EP,US);
B65H65/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1987/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFNEHMEN LANGGESTRECKTEN GUTES | [1987/28] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TAKING UP ELONGATED MATERIAL | [1987/28] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ENROULEMENT DE MATERIAUX ALLONGES | [1987/28] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.1987 | Translation filed | 23.02.1987 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.1987 | Search fee paid | 23.02.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/28] | 07.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB665357 (BRITISH UNITED SHOE MACHINERY, et al) | International search | [Y]JPS56103044 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPH05916656 ; | [Y]JPH05671562 ; | [Y]JPS52100979U ; | [Y]JPS59230967 (NIPPON STEEL WELDING PROD ENG) |