EP0231210 - LONG LIFE FOOD PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1990 | Change - withdrawal | published on 28.02.1990 [1990/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LARSEN, Trevor Allan 69 Sir Thomas Mitchell Drive Davidson, NSW 2085 / AU | For all designated states LARSEN, Valerie Louise 69 Sir Thomas Mitchell Drive Davidson, NSW 2085 / AU | [1987/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/33] | Representative(s) | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/33] | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 86904046.9 | 08.07.1986 | [1987/33] | WO1986AU00191 | Priority number, date | AU19850001556 | 19.07.1985 Original published format: AU 155685 | [1987/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8700506 | Date: | 29.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0231210 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 29.01.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65B31/00, B65B25/16, A21D15/00 | [1987/33] | CPC: |
B65B25/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/33] | Title | German: | LANGE HALTBARES NAHRUNGSMITTEL | [1987/33] | English: | LONG LIFE FOOD PRODUCT | [1987/33] | French: | PRODUIT ALIMENTAIRE DE LONGUE CONSERVATION | [1987/33] | File destroyed: | 24.06.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.1987 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.1987 | Search fee paid | 14.04.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/38] | 20.08.1987 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 22.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 10.12.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1989 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2719113 ; | [A]DE2722621 ; | [A]US3983256 ; | [A]GB723635 | [A] - FOOD TECHNOLOGY, vol. 38, no. 3, March 1984, pages 67-71,73, Chicago, Illinois, US; F.M. TERLIZZI et al.: "Processing and distributing cooked meats in flexible films" | International search | [X]AU4065078 ; | [X]US4357356 ; | [Y]AU1226876 ; | [Y]DE2906272 ; | [Y]CH118702 ; | [Y]CH381185 ; | [Y]FR2062520 ; | [Y]DE1442010 |