EP0232292 - PIVOTING-ARM ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1990 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.1990 [1990/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOSDOWSKI, Gerhard Camberleystr. 83 D-7120 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [1987/34] | Application number, filing date | 86904082.4 | 01.07.1986 | [1987/34] | WO1986DE00269 | Priority number, date | DE19853528769 | 10.08.1985 Original published format: DE 3528769 | [1987/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8700789 | Date: | 12.02.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0232292 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0232292 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/04, B25J19/00 | [1987/34] | CPC: |
B25J9/044 (EP,US);
B25J19/0008 (EP,US);
B25J9/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/34] | Title | German: | SCHWENKARMROBOTER | [1987/34] | English: | PIVOTING-ARM ROBOT | [1987/34] | French: | ROBOT A BRAS PIVOTANTS | [1987/34] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.1987 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/34] | 02.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE3310107 [ ] (MANTEC AUTOMATISIERUNG [DE]); | DE2224349 [ ] (PIETZSCH LUDWIG); | DE8511473U [ ] |