EP0229126 - PLASMINOGEN ACTIVATOR INHIBITOR MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES, HYBRIDOMAS, MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY PRODUCTION AND USE OF THE ANTIBODIES FOR PURIFICATION, REMOVAL, INHIBITION OR ASSAY OF THE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 22.05.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.1998 | Opposition rejected | published on 08.07.1998 [1998/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FONDEN TIL FREMME AF EKSPERIMENTEL CANCERFORSKNING c/o Advokat Michael Rostock Vester Voldgade 90 DK-1552 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | For all designated states FONDEN TIL FREMME AF EKSPERIMENTAL CANCERFORSKNING c/o Advokat Michael Rostock Vester Voldgade 90 DK-1552 Copenhagen V / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIELSEN, Lars, Soegaard 18, Egedalsvaenge DK-2980 Kokkedal / DK | 02 /
ANDREASEN, Peter, André 7, Maglebytorv DK-2791 Dragor / DK | 03 /
DANO, Keld 20, L.E. Bruunsvej DK-2920 Charlottenlund / DK | [1994/14] |
Former [1987/30] | 01 /
NIELSEN, Lars, Soegaard 18, Egedalsvaenge DK-2980 Kokkedal / DK | ||
02 /
ANDREASEN, Peter, André 7, Maglebytorv DK-2791 Dragor / DK | |||
03 /
DANOR, Keld 20, L.E. Bruunsvej DK-2920 Charlottenlund / DK | Representative(s) | Plougmann, Ole, et al Plougmann, Vingtoft & Partners, Sankt Annae Plads 11, P.O. Box 3007 1021 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | Plougmann, Ole, et al c/o Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S, Sankt Annae Plads 11, P.O. Box 3007 DK-1021 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [1987/30] | Brown, John David FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86904118.6 | 11.07.1986 | [1987/30] | WO1986DK00080 | Priority number, date | DK19850003196 | 12.07.1985 Original published format: DK 319685 | [1987/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8700549 | Date: | 29.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0229126 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0229126 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K15/06, G01N33/53, G01N33/577, G01N33/86 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
C07K14/8132 (EP);
C07K16/38 (EP);
G01N33/577 (EP);
G01N33/86 (EP);
G01N2333/8132 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/30] | C12N5/00, C12N15/00, A61K39/395, C07K15/06, G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/30] | Title | German: | MONOKLONALER ANTIKÖRPER-INHIBITOR DES PLASMINOGENAKTIVATORS, HYBRIDOMEN, HERSTELLUNG MONOKLONALER ANTIKÖRPER UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR REINIGUNG, BESEITIGUNG, INHIBITION ODER ZUM TESTVERFAHREN VON INHIBITOREN | [1987/30] | English: | PLASMINOGEN ACTIVATOR INHIBITOR MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES, HYBRIDOMAS, MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY PRODUCTION AND USE OF THE ANTIBODIES FOR PURIFICATION, REMOVAL, INHIBITION OR ASSAY OF THE INHIBITORS | [1987/30] | French: | ANTICORPS MONOCLONAUX D'INHIBITEURS D'ACTIVATEURS DE PLASMINOGENE, HYBRIDOMES, PRODUCTION DE CES ANTICORPS MONOCLONAUX ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR PURIFIER, ELIMINER, INHIBER OU ANALYSER LES INHIBITEURS | [1987/30] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1994/14: Teilanmeldung 93202290.8 eingereicht am 11/07/86 | EPB 1994/14: Divisional application 93202290.8 filed on 11/07/86 | EPB 1994/14: Demande divisionnaire 93202290.8 déposée le 11/07/86 | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.1987 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 04.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 18.06.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP93202290.8 / EP0585995 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.1995
24.01.1995
ADMISSIBLE Dr. Richard Hart 222Railroad Avenue Greenwich, Connecticut / US Opponent's representative Moll, Walter Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | 02
09.01.1995
06.02.1995
ADMISSIBLE The Scripps Research Institute 10666 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla, California 92037 / US Opponent's representative Fisher, Adrian John Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.1995
24.01.1995
ADMISSIBLE Dr. Richard Hart 222Railroad Avenue Greenwich, Connecticut / US Opponent's representative Moll, Walter, Dipl.-Phys., Dr. Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | ||
02
09.01.1995
06.02.1995
ADMISSIBLE The Scripps Research Institute 10666 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla, California 92037 / US Opponent's representative Fisher, Adrian John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | 22.02.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.11.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.02.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.02.1997 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.02.1998 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 22.02.1998 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1998/28] | Request for further processing for: | 17.08.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 21.08.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.10.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | WO8600413 [ ]; | EP0169549 [ ]; | BE896543 [ ] | [A] - Chemical Abstracts, vol 102 (1985), abstract 20239n, Biochim Biophys Acta 1984, 302(1), 111-18 | [Y] - Chemical Abstracts, vol 102 (1985), abstract 145108a, Tromb, Haemostasis 1985, 53 (1), 122-5 | [P] - Chemical Abstracts, vol 104, (1986), abstract 66584r, Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A 1985, 82 (24), 8710-14 | [P] - Chemical Abstracts; vol 103 (1985), abstract 191901x, J Lab Clin Med 1985, 106(4), 408-15 | [A] - Chemical abstracts, vol 103 (1985), abstract 83888q, Thromb Haemostasis 1985, 53(3), 356-9 | [A] - Chemical Abstracts, vol 101 (1984), abstract 167884g, Biochim Biophys Acta 1984, 801(2), 163-70 | Examination | WO8600413 | EP2169549 | - The Journal of biological chemistry, vol.259, n° 23, pages 14914-14921, 1984 |