EP0228434 - OPTICAL COUPLING ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [1987/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBB, Roderick, Peter Shimaker Cottage Stone Common Blaxhall Woodbridge, Suffolk / GB | [1987/29] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, John David, et al British Telecom Intellectual Property Unit 151 Gower Street London WC1 6BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | Greenwood, John David, et al British Telecom Intellectual Property Unit 151 Gower Street London WC1E 6BA / GB | ||
Former [1988/52] | Pratt, David Martin Intellectual Property Unit British Telecom 151 Gower Street London WC1E 6BA / GB | ||
Former [1987/29] | Wolff, Eric BRITISH TELECOM Intellectual Property Unit 13th Floor 151 Gower Street London WC1E 6BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 86904238.2 | 18.06.1986 | [1987/29] | WO1986GB00352 | Priority number, date | GB19850015583 | 19.06.1985 Original published format: GB 8515583 | GB19850015500 | 19.06.1985 Original published format: GB 8515500 | [1987/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8607642 | Date: | 31.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0228434 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0228434 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/21, H04B10/00, H01S3/05 | [1990/52] | CPC: |
G02F1/3517 (EP,US);
H04B10/25891 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/29] | G02F1/21, H01S3/06, H04B9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/29] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE KOPPLUNGSANORDNUNG | [1987/29] | English: | OPTICAL COUPLING ASSEMBLY | [1987/29] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE COUPLAGE OPTIQUE | [1987/29] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.1987 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/29] | 16.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US3691387 [ ] (DELANGE OWEN EDWARD); | US3908121 [ ] (RISEBERG LESLIE A, et al); | EP0143561 [ ] (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) | [A] - Electronics Letters, Vol. 19, No. 14, 7 July 1983 (London, GB) R. WYATT et al.: "1,52 mum PSK Heterodyne Experiment Featuring an External Cavity Diode Laser Local Oscillator", pages 550-552, see especially figure 1 | [A] - Electronics Letters, Vol. 18, No. 5, 4 March 1982 (New York, US) S. KOBAYASHI et al.: "Optical Phase Modulation in an Injection Locked AlGaAs Semiconductor Laser", pages 210-211, see especially figure 1 | [A] - Laser and Optoelektronik, Vol. 16, No. 1, February 1984 (Stuttgart, DE) R. KIST et al.: "Faser- und Integriert-Optische Monomode-Sensoren: Eine Ubersicht", pages 17-30, see especially figures 1, 5-6 | Examination | - Electronics Letters, vol. 18, no. 5, 4. March 1982 NEW YORK, US; S.Kobayashi et al.:"Optical phase modulation in an injection locked A1GaAs semiconductor laser", pages 210-211 |