EP0272323 - DEVICE FOR THERMAL REMOVAL OF BARBS FROM PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KHARKOVSKY AVIATSIONNY INST. IMENI N.E. ZHUKOVSKOGO ul. Chkalova, 17 Kharkov, 310191 / SU | [1988/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOZHKO, Valery Pavlovich ul. Chkalova, 13-56 Kharkov, 310084 / SU | 02 /
YATSENKO, Sergei Vasilievich pr. Pobedy, 76-116 Kharkov, 310204 / SU | 03 /
STRIZHENKO, Vitaly Evgenievich ul. Osnovyanskaya, 56 Kharkov, 310010 / SU | 04 /
LOSEV, Alexei Vasilievich Saltovskoe shosse, 240a-11 Kharkov, 310171 / SU | 05 /
PLESHKOV, Viktor Ivanovich ul. Gvardeitsev Shironintsev, 26-204 Kharkov, 310120 / SU | 06 /
JUNASH, Viktor Maximovich ul. Pervoi Konnoi Armii, 101 Kharkov, 310000 / SU | [1988/26] | Representative(s) | Finck, Dieter, et al V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 2-3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/26] | Finck, Dieter, Dr.Ing., et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 - 3 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86904465.1 | 30.04.1986 | [1988/26] | WO1986SU00037 | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8706510 | Date: | 05.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0272323 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0272323 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SU | 05.11.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B23K7/06 | [1988/26] | CPC: |
B23D79/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/26] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUM THERMISCHEN ENTGRATEN VON STÜCKEN | [1988/26] | English: | DEVICE FOR THERMAL REMOVAL OF BARBS FROM PARTS | [1988/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EBARBAGE THERMIQUE | [1988/26] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1987 | Translation filed | 17.12.1987 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1987 | Search fee paid | 17.12.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/26] | 25.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 03.07.1991 | IT | 03.07.1991 | FR | 22.11.1991 | [1999/42] |
Former [1992/25] | GB | 03.07.1991 | |
FR | 22.11.1991 | ||
Former [1992/16] | GB | 03.07.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]SU795823 ; | [Y]DE2525012 (UHDE GMBH FRIEDRICH); | [A]DE2440041 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) | [Y] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, Sektion M, Woche D40, 11. November 1981, Derwent Publications Ltd, GB; & SU-A-795 823 (KHARK AVIAT INST) 25-01-1981, & SU795823 A 00000000 | International search | [A]GB1170017 (CHEMOTRONICS INTERNATIONAL INC [US]); | [A]DE3314397 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US4413814 (LOBASTOV GEORGE S [US]) |