EP0229154 - ASCORBATE 2-POLYPHOSPHATE ESTERS AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1991 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANSAS STATE UNIVERSITY RESEARCH FOUNDATION 207 Fairchild Hall, Kansas State University Manhattan Kansas 66506 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | For all designated states KANSAS STATE UNIVERSITY RESEARCH FOUNDATION 207 Fairchild Hall, Kansas State University Manhattan, Kansas 66506 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEIB, Paul, A. 836 Dondee Manhattan, KS 66506 / US | 02 /
LIAO, Ming-Long X-32 Jardine Terrace Manhattan, KS 66506 / US | [1987/30] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 86904521.1 | 18.06.1986 | [1987/30] | WO1986US01299 | Priority number, date | US19850749081 | 25.06.1985 Original published format: US 749081 | [1987/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8700172 | Date: | 15.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0229154 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0229154 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.01.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/08 | [1987/30] | CPC: |
A61P3/02 (EP);
C07F9/65515 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/30] | Title | German: | ASKORBAT-2-POLYPHOSPHATESTER UND DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [1987/30] | English: | ASCORBATE 2-POLYPHOSPHATE ESTERS AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME | [1987/30] | French: | ESTERS DE 2-POLYPHOSPHATE D'ASCORBATE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [1987/30] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.1987 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.1987 | Search fee paid | 17.03.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 02.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 01.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.11.1988 | 02.07.1990 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.09.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4179445 (DEYOE CHARLES W [US], et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 74, No. 7, issued 15 February 1971 (Columbus, Ohio, USA) NOMURA et al "Ascorbic Acid Phosphates", see page 322, column 1. Abstract No. 31939V. Japan. 70 30,328. 01 October 1970. | Examination | - A.L.LEHNINGER, "BIOCHEMISTRY" WORTH PUBLISHERS. 1970, PAGES 304-308. |