EP0230452 - CRYSTALLINE ZEOLITE LZ-202 AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU State(s) deleted from list of lapses: BE | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANNAN, Thomas, Richard 9-4 Oxford Drive Valley Cottage, NY 10989 / US | [1987/32] | Representative(s) | Eggert, Hans-Gunther Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | Eggert, Hans-Gunther, Dr. Räderscheidtstrasse 1 D-50935 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 86904614.4 | 07.07.1986 | [1987/32] | WO1986US01405 | Priority number, date | US19850752555 | 08.07.1985 Original published format: US 752555 | [1987/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8700158 | Date: | 15.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0230452 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0230452 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/28 | [1987/32] | CPC: |
C01B39/34 (EP,US);
Y10S423/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/32] | Title | German: | KRISTALLINER ZEOLITH LZ-202 UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [1987/32] | English: | CRYSTALLINE ZEOLITE LZ-202 AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING SAME | [1987/32] | French: | ZEOLITHE CRISTALLINE LZ-202 ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [1987/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.1987 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/32] | 09.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.07.1989 | [1999/52] |
Former [1990/26] | BE | 31.07.1989 | Cited in | International search | [Y]SU1125190 ; | US4503023 [ ] (BRECK DONALD W [US], et al) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 102, No. 10, 11 March 1985, (Columbus, Ohio, US), see page 128, Abstract No. 81109s, & SU, A, 1125190 (P.G. MELIKISHVILI, Institute of Physical and Organic Chemistry) 23 November 1984, & SU1125190 A 00000000 |