EP0229166 - METHOD OF PREPARING TISSUE SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BONE DIAGNOSTIC CENTER, INC. 1235 Eldemere Road Lexington, KY 40502 / US | [1987/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALLUCHE, Hartmut, H. 1235 Eldemere Road Lexington, KY 40502 / US | 02 /
MALLUCHE, Gisela 1235 Eldemere Road Lexington, KY 40502 / US | [1987/30] | Representative(s) | Marshall, Monica Anne, et al GALLAFENT & CO. 8 Staple Inn London WC1V 7QH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/11] | Marshall, Monica Anne, et al GALLAFENT & CO. 8 Staple Inn London WC1V 7QH / GB | ||
Former [1987/30] | Gallafent, Richard John GALLAFENT & CO. 8 Staple Inn London WCIV 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 86904622.7 | 07.07.1986 | [1987/30] | WO1986US01414 | Priority number, date | US19850751960 | 05.07.1985 Original published format: US 751960 | [1987/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8700004 | Date: | 15.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0229166 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0229166 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.01.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/00, B05D3/06, G01N1/00, G01N1/28, G01N1/30, G02B21/34 | [1987/30] | CPC: |
G01N1/44 (EP,US);
A01N1/00 (EP,US);
G01N1/312 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/30] | Title | German: | GEWEBEMUSTERNAHME | [1987/30] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARING TISSUE SAMPLES | [1987/30] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ECHANTILLONS DE TISSUS | [1987/30] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.1987 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.1987 | Search fee paid | 09.03.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/37] | 22.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 20.12.1989 | Appeal received | 23.02.1990 | Statement of grounds filed | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.09.1992 | BE | 23.09.1992 | CH | 23.09.1992 | IT | 23.09.1992 | LI | 23.09.1992 | NL | 23.09.1992 | SE | 23.09.1992 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 23.09.1992 | |
BE | 23.09.1992 | ||
CH | 23.09.1992 | ||
IT | 23.09.1992 | ||
LI | 23.09.1992 | ||
NL | 23.09.1992 | ||
SE | 23.09.1992 | ||
Former [1994/18] | AT | 23.09.1992 | |
BE | 23.09.1992 | ||
CH | 23.09.1992 | ||
LI | 23.09.1992 | ||
NL | 23.09.1992 | ||
SE | 23.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/21] | BE | 23.09.1992 | |
CH | 23.09.1992 | ||
LI | 23.09.1992 | ||
NL | 23.09.1992 | ||
SE | 23.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/19] | BE | 23.09.1992 | |
CH | 23.09.1992 | ||
LI | 23.09.1992 | ||
SE | 23.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/16] | CH | 23.09.1992 | |
LI | 23.09.1992 | ||
SE | 23.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | CH | 23.09.1992 | |
LI | 23.09.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - HISTOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, vol. 16, no. 11, 1984, pages 1171-1191, Chapman and Hall Ltd; D. HOPWOOD et al.: "Microwave fixation: its potential for routine techniques, histochemistry, immunocytochemistry and electron microscopy" | International search | US3679450 [ ] (BEIGHTOL LEROY EARL); | JPS4943127B [ ]; | US3961097 [ ] (GRAVLEE JR JOSEPH F); | US4205059 [ ] (VON HAGENS GUNTHER [DE]); | JPS58219005 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | US4545831 [ ] (ORNSTEIN LEONARD [US]) | [Y] - PETRERE et al, "Microwave Fixation of Fetal Specimens", Stain Technology, Volume 52, No. 2, published 1977, pages 113-114, see page 113, paragraphs 3 and 4. | [Y] - HOPWOOD et al, Biosis Previews 69-86, Biosis No. 79050815, published 1984 see entire document. |