EP0231266 - METHOD AND COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF CHRONIC OBSTRUCTIVE PULMONARY DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.09.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Key Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2000 Galloping Hills Road Kenilworth New Jersey 07033 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | For all designated states Key Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2000 Galloping Hills Road Kenilworth New Jersey 07033 / US | ||
Former [1987/33] | For all designated states Key Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 4400 Biscayne Boulevard Miami, Florida 33137 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHMED, Tahir 2333 Brickell Avenue, No. 2205 Miami, FL 33129 / US | 02 /
SACKNER, Marvin 300 W. Rivo Alto Drive Miami, FL 33157 / US | [1987/33] | Representative(s) | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/33] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 86904627.6 | 01.07.1986 | [1987/33] | WO1986US01419 | Priority number, date | US19850751114 | 02.07.1985 Original published format: US 751114 | [1987/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8700047 | Date: | 15.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0231266 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/72, A61K45/06, A61K31/275, // (A61K31/275, 31:135) | [1987/33] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K9/00 (KR);
A61K31/275 (EP,KR);
A61K9/0073 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/275, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG CHRONISCH OBSTRUKTIVER LUNGENKRANKHEITEN | [1987/33] | English: | METHOD AND COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF CHRONIC OBSTRUCTIVE PULMONARY DISEASE | [1987/33] | French: | PROCEDE ET COMPOSITION DE TRAITEMENT D'AFFECTIONS PULMONAIRES OBSTRUCTIVES CHRONIQUES | [1987/33] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.1987 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/33] | 13.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 08.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.04.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/47] | 20.06.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1991/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 85, No. 15, 11 October 1976 (Columbus, Ohio, US) H. BOBBAERS et al.: "Action of Isoprenaline on the Mechanical Properties of Lungs and Airways in Healthy People and Patients with Obstructive Lung Diseases", see page 64, Abstract No. 104169h, & Bull. Eur. Physiopathol. Respir. 1976, 12(4), 515-31 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 88, No. 17, 24 April 1978 (Columbus, Ohio, US) M.A. SACKNER et al.: "The Pulmonary Hemodynamic Effects of Aerosols of Isoproterenol and Ipratropium in Normal Subjects and Patients with Reversible Airway Obstruction", see page 56, Abstract No. 115427d, & Am. Rev. Respir. Dis. 1977, 116(6), 1013-22 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 97, No. 11, 13 September 1982 (Columbus, Ohio, US) P. EYRE et al.: "Equine Influenza Virus Enhances Responsiveness of Quinea Pig Tracheal Muscle to Isoprenaline", see page 564, Abstract No. 89884q, & Res. Commun. Chem. Pathol. Pharmacol. 1982, 37(1), 3-10 |