EP0233231 - GELATINE CAPSULES AND PROCESS FOR THEIR MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.06.1991 [1991/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.P. Scherer GmbH Gammelsbacher Strasse 2 69412 Eberbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/35] | For all designated states R.P. Scherer GmbH Gammelsbacher Strasse 2 D-69412 Eberbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCHER, Gerhard Hohenstaufenstrasse 28/1 D-6930 Eberbach/Baden / DE | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Benedikt Melanchthonweg 50 D-7150 Backnang / DE | 03 /
JAHN, Helmut Olgastrasse 109 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | [1987/35] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/35] | Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 86904825.6 | 16.08.1986 | [1987/35] | WO1986EP00485 | Priority number, date | DE19853529694 | 20.08.1985 Original published format: DE 3529694 | [1987/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8701034 | Date: | 26.02.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0233231 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0233231 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/48, A61K9/66 | [1987/35] | CPC: |
A61K9/4825 (EP,US);
A61K9/48 (KR);
A61K9/0056 (EP,US);
A61K9/4816 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/35] | Title | German: | GELATINEKAPSELN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [1987/35] | English: | GELATINE CAPSULES AND PROCESS FOR THEIR MANUFACTURE | [1987/35] | French: | CAPSULES DE GELATINE ET LEUR PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1987/35] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1990/25: Teilanmeldung 89110787.2 eingereicht am 16/08/86 | EPB 1990/25: Divisional application 89110787.2 filed on 16/08/86 | EPB 1990/25: Demande divisionnaire 89110787.2 déposée le 16/08/86 | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.1987 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 18.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP89110787.2 / EP0337509 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US2580683 [ ] (PIETER KREUGER); | FR2193059 [ ] (NAT STARCH CHEM CORP [US]); | FR2261752 [ ] (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) | Examination | EP0120248 | EP0199034 |