EP0231338 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FASTENING HOLLOW SECTIONS TOGETHER BY MEANS OF CONNECTION PIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 02.03.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nyströms Beslag AB S-335 00 Gnosjö / SE | [1988/19] |
Former [1987/33] | For all designated states HIB PROMOTION AB Drottningtorget 2 S-211 25 Malmö / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖRRESEN, Hans, Jan Scaniagatan 15 S-216 18 Malmö / SE | [1987/33] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl Heinz Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/33] | Wagner, Karl Heinz H. Wagner & Co. AB Norra Vallgatan 72 S-211 22 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 86904981.7 | 07.08.1986 | [1987/33] | WO1986SE00358 | Priority number, date | SE19850003739 | 08.08.1985 Original published format: SE 8503739 | [1987/33] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8700884 | Date: | 12.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0231338 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0231338 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 12.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/96, B21D53/74 | [1987/33] | CPC: |
B25B5/142 (EP);
E06B3/968 (SE);
E06B3/9612 (EP);
E06B3/9681 (SE)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/33] | Title | German: | METHODE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBINDEN VON HOHLEN TEILEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON VERBINDUNGSSTÜCKEN | [1987/33] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FASTENING HOLLOW SECTIONS TOGETHER BY MEANS OF CONNECTION PIECES | [1987/33] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR ASSEMBLER DES PROFILES CREUX AU MOYEN DE PIECES DE CONNEXION | [1987/33] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.1987 | Translation filed | 30.03.1987 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/47] | 12.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.1990
01.08.1990
ADMISSIBLE BUG-Alutechnik GmbH Bergstrasse 17 D-7981 Vogt / DE Opponent's representative Engelhardt, Guido Patentanwalt Postfach 13 50 88003 Friedrichshafen / DE | 02
16.07.1990
01.08.1990
ADMISSIBLE ROTO FRANK AG Postfach 10 01 58 D-70745 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.1990
01.08.1990
ADMISSIBLE BUG-Alutechnik GmbH Bergstrasse 17 D-7981 Vogt / DE Opponent's representative Engelhardt, Guido, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 13 50 D-88003 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
02
16.07.1990
01.08.1990
ADMISSIBLE ROTO FRANK AG Postfach 10 01 58 D-70745 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 30.08.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 21.10.1991 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1992/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.08.1987 | M02   Fee paid on   22.09.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.08.1990 | GB | 07.08.1991 | SE | 08.08.1991 | BE | 31.08.1991 | [2015/21] |
Former [1999/52] | CH | 18.10.1989 | |
LI | 18.10.1989 | ||
LU | 31.08.1990 | ||
GB | 07.08.1991 | ||
SE | 08.08.1991 | ||
BE | 31.08.1991 | ||
Former [1992/37] | CH | 18.10.1989 | |
LI | 18.10.1989 | ||
GB | 07.08.1991 | ||
SE | 08.08.1991 | ||
BE | 31.08.1991 | ||
Former [1992/34] | CH | 18.10.1989 | |
LI | 18.10.1989 | ||
GB | 07.08.1991 | ||
SE | 08.08.1991 | ||
Former [1992/33] | CH | 18.10.1989 | |
LI | 18.10.1989 | ||
SE | 08.08.1991 | ||
Former [1992/21] | SE | 08.08.1991 | Cited in | International search | DE2500937 [ ] (UHL KG GEB); | DE2757886 [ ] (KLIMA & KAELTE GMBH); | WO8202572 [ ] (SCHMIDLIN HANS [CH]); | SE438704 [ ] (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) |