EP0233254 - DATA STORAGE APPARATUS FOR DIGITAL DATA PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.1991 [1991/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COPE, David 18 Orchard Street Medfield, MA 02052 / US | For all designated states SPLETTER, Gary 770 Boylston Street 2H, Boston, MA 02199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/35] | For all designated states COPE, David 18 Orchard Street Medfield, MA 02052 / US | ||
For all designated states SPLETTER, Gary 770 Boylston Street #2H, Boston, MA 02199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/35] | Representative(s) | Endlich, Fritz Patentanwalt Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/35] | Endlich, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86905094.8 | 06.08.1986 | [1987/35] | WO1986US01631 | Priority number, date | US19850763844 | 08.08.1985 Original published format: US 763844 | [1987/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8700959 | Date: | 12.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0233254 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.02.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11C5/02 | [1987/35] | CPC: |
G11C5/02 (EP);
G11C11/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/35] | Title | German: | DATENSPEICHERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIGITALDATENBEARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [1987/35] | English: | DATA STORAGE APPARATUS FOR DIGITAL DATA PROCESSING SYSTEM | [1987/35] | French: | APPAREIL DE MEMORISATION DE DONNEES POUR SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES NUMERIQUES | [1987/35] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.1987 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.1987 | Search fee paid | 30.04.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/41] | 26.08.1987 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 20.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 01.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/37] | 12.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1991/37] | 12.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1989 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.02.1990 | 31.08.1990 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2911627 ; | [A]US3267445 ; | [A]CH355814 ; | [A]US3214740 | International search | US3633188 [ ]; | US3708789 [ ]; | US4416056 [ ] |