EP0235203 - FILM VIDEO PLAYER/PRINTER WITH CROPPING CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.02.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1987/37] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation) 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWNSTEIN, Scott, Alan c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY, patent dept. 343 State Street, Rochester, N.Y. 14650 / US | 02 /
Funston, David Lee c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY, patent dept 343 State Street, Rochester, N.Y. 14650 / US | [1991/08] |
Former [1987/37] | 01 /
BROWNSTEIN, Scott, Alan 210 Winona Blvd. Rochester, NY 14617 / US | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Peter, et al KODAK Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Schmidt, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al KODAK Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung D-70323 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1987/37] | Schmidt, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Kodak Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung D-70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 86905123.5 | 15.08.1986 | [1987/37] | WO1986US01673 | Priority number, date | US19850770121 | 28.08.1985 Original published format: US 770121 | [1987/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8701473 | Date: | 12.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0235203 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0235203 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/08] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0235203 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G03B27/46, H04N1/387 | [1987/37] | CPC: |
G03B27/462 (EP,US);
H04N1/38 (EP,US);
H04N1/3875 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/37] | Title | German: | FILM-VIDEOWIEDERGABE/BELICHTUNGSGERÄT MIT AUSSCHNITTFLÄCHENSTEUERUNG | [1987/37] | English: | FILM VIDEO PLAYER/PRINTER WITH CROPPING CONTROL | [1987/37] | French: | LECTEUR VIDEO/TIREUSE PHOTOGRAPHIQUE AVEC COMMANDE DE REPRODUCTION SELECTIVE | [1987/37] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.1987 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/43] | 19.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.11.1991
14.02.1992
ADMISSIBLE Agfa-Gevaert AG -Patentabteilung- Postfach D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.11.1991
14.02.1992
ADMISSIBLE Agfa-Gevaert AG -Patentabteilung- Postfach D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | 19.02.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.06.1992 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.07.1992 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 25.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 02.08.1993 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.08.1993 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 19.01.1994 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US4496983 [ ] (TAKENAKA YUJI [JP]); | US4482924 [ ] (BROWNSTEIN SCOTT A [US]) |