EP0238519 - DEVICE FOR SPRAYING PRESSURE-SUPPLIED LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHOTTE GMBH Stephanopel 70 D-5870 Hemer / DE | [1987/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Karl-Heinz Im Wiehagen 5 D-5870 Hemer / DE | [1987/40] | Application number, filing date | 86905195.3 | 20.08.1986 | [1987/40] | WO1986DE00335 | Priority number, date | DE19850027239U | 24.09.1985 Original published format: DE 8527239 U | [1987/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8701618 | Date: | 26.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0238519 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/12, B05B11/00 | [1987/40] | CPC: |
B05B11/0005 (EP);
B05B1/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/40] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERSPRÜHEN VON UNTER DRUCK ZUGEFÜRHTEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [1987/40] | English: | DEVICE FOR SPRAYING PRESSURE-SUPPLIED LIQUIDS | [1987/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROJECTION DE LIQUIDES ALIMENTES SOUS PRESSION | [1987/40] | File destroyed: | 25.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 26.06.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/19] | 10.11.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1988/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.06.1987 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 25.06.1987 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 25.06.1987 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 25.06.1987 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 25.06.1987 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 25.06.1987 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 25.06.1987 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 25.06.1987 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 25.06.1987 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 25.06.1987 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.09.1987 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR1334471 [ ]; | US2681831 [ ] (BARTON BENJAMIN D); | US2772031 [ ] (ROSELUND HAROLD A); | GB1441649 [ ] (GLOVER CO LTD THOMAS); | FR2347985 [ ] (BERTHOUD SA [FR]); | WO8502562 [ ] (SCHOTTE WERNER [DE]); | US4109869 [ ] (BROCKELSBY NORMAN D, et al); | US4013228 [ ] (SCHNEIDER BARRY L) |